THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:32:54 AM
Ralph-Edwards, Robin Andrea
CPSO#:
109122
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jan 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2016
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth St
9N - 939 Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4798
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:03 Nov 2023 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBIN ANDREA RALPH-EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RALPH-EDWARDS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2024 |