THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:13:27 AM
Dortaj, Nick
CPSO#:
108917
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
28 Jun 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Persian
Education: KERMAN UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
102-535 Mulock Dr
All Med Health Family Medicine and
Newmarket ON L3Y 5H2
Phone: (905) 727-4241
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 May 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 17 Apr 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Mar 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jun 2023 |
|
Active |