THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:43:38 AM
O'Brien, Teresa Mary
CPSO#:
108902
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Feb 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Feb 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College of Dublin, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
8-105 Sutherland Dr
Kingston ON K7K 5V6
Phone: 6137660318
Fax: 6137660339
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter S.C. De Jager Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 21 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jun 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TERESA MARY O'BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRIEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 May 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 18 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jan 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Feb 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 2020 |