THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 20:23:44 PM
Orellana, Cesar Emiliano
CPSO#:
108875
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Infectious Disease Clinic
PO Box 9056
835 King St. West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-749-4348
Fax: 1-844-239-2791
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:27 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CESAR EMILIANO ORELLANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORELLANA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 May 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 May 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2017 |