THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:48:38 AM
Kazerouni, Abdul Hamid
CPSO#:
108603
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Pathology and
Molecular Medicine
711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 42063
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:22 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Apr 2016 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jan 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2022 |
|
Active |