THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:45:33 PM
Afshar, Mehdi
CPSO#:
108577
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
05 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
5-Jan-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: George Washington University, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 2016 to 01 May 2016
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 04 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 May 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 05 Jan 2022 |