THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:23:03 PM
Bonin, Dominique Jacqueline Marie
CPSO#:
108555
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
189 Elm St
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2030
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Denis Bonin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
West Nipissing General Hospital |
Sturgeon Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:15 Oct 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOMINIQUE JACQUELINE MARIE BONIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Mar 2016 to 27 Mar 2016
EL - Emergency Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 28 Mar 2016 to 10 Apr 2016
EL - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 20 Jun 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Apr 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2017 |