THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 5:26:20 AM
Shakeel, Nazneen
CPSO#:
108497
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Sindhi, Urdu
Education: University of Sind, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Great Lakes Medical Centre
25-B Great Lakes Drive
Brampton ON L6R 2S5
Phone: (905) 494-0302
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Mississippi
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAZNEEN SHAKEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAKEEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2016 to 31 Mar 2016
EL - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Oct 2017
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: January 5, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)