THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:05:00 PM
Luu, Judy Mai
CPSO#:
108493
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Calgary, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
385 Wilson St E
Ancaster Cardiology Clinic
Cardiology
Suite 205
Ancaster ON L9G 2C1
Phone: (905-648-6883
Fax: 905-648-1288
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:15 Sep 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUDY MAI LUU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 22 Feb 2016 to 13 Mar 2016
EL - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 2021 |