THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:59:29 AM
Shirazi, Sahar
CPSO#:
108355
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
suite 128-820 Mcconnel Avenue
Cornwall ON K6H4M4
Phone: 6134029188
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAHAR SHIRAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIRAZI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Jan 2016 to 13 Mar 2016
EL - Surgical Oncology
McMaster University, 13 Feb 2017 to 12 Mar 2017
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2017 to 09 Apr 2017
EL - Surgical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Mar 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2018 |