THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:44:47 AM
Jairath, Vipul
CPSO#:
108346
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Feb 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
21 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital, Room A10-228
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3655
Fax: (519) 663-3658
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:21 Dec 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:14 Jul 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Dec 2015 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 Feb 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 May 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jul 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jul 2023 |
|
Active |