THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:53:48 PM
O'Kane, Grainne Mary
CPSO#:
108292
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Sep 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. John Kavanagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 23 Mar 2016
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2019 to 23 Mar 2019
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 17 Sep 2019
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Sep 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2019 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |