THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:27:21 PM
Mkondo, Allen Samuel Arhen
CPSO#:
108080
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jul 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Zimbabwe, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brantford Children Walk in Clinic
225 Fairview Drive
Suite 3
Brantford ON N3R 7E3
Phone: (519)304-5460
Fax: (519)304-6460
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
South Africa
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:16 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALLEN SAMUEL ARHEN MKONDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MKONDO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2015 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2022 |