THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 10:13:42 AM
Natt, Diljaan Singh
CPSO#:
108065
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Kasturba Medical College, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 128
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie, Ontario
L4N7L3
Barrie ON L4N7L3
Phone: 705-726-0173
Fax: 705-725-9575
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Oct 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DILJAAN SINGH NATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2015 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 28 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Feb 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2018 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2020 |