THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:30:00 PM
Ojha, Sujata
CPSO#:
108061
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Mar 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi
Education: Gandhi Medical College, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Western Ontario
Schulich School of Medicine
Department of Psychiatry
550 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 667-6664
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:15 Mar 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Sep 2015 to 12 Oct 2015
PEAP - R - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Oct 2015 to 28 Feb 2016
EL - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Feb 2016 to 12 Oct 2016
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Oct 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |