THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:34:54 AM
Samiee-Zafarghandy, Ehsan
CPSO#:
108055
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-451 Paxton St
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Phone: 4168449828
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site |
Port Perry |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Oct 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EHSAN SAMIEE-ZAFARGHANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMIEE-ZAFARGHANDY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2015 to 10 Jan 2016
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2017 |