THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:18:02 PM
Mokhber, Naghmeh
CPSO#:
108034
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
28 Sep 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Southwest Centre for Forensic
Mental Health Care
Po Box 5777 Stn B
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 631-8510 Ext. 49779
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Forensic Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Aug 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Aug 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAGHMEH MOKHBER may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. MOKHBER holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. MOKHBER may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MOKHBER no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. MOKHBER no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. MOKHBER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
CF - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Aug 2017
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2021 |