THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:19:28 AM
Butler, Dorianne Elizabeth
CPSO#:
108023
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
186 Talbot St S
Essex ON N8M 1B6
Phone: (519) 961-9699
Fax: (519) 961-9599
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Aug 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DORIANNE ELIZABETH BUTLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTLER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Sep 2015 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 21 Mar 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2017 |