THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:10:29 AM
Harricharan, Monisha
CPSO#:
108008
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Dec 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Dec 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
110-355 Wellington St
Middlesex-London Health Unit
Sexual Health
Suite 110
London ON N6A 3N7
Phone: 519-663-5317
Fax: 519-663-8273
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Rajendra Harricharan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONISHA HARRICHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRICHARAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Oct 2015 to 12 Jan 2016
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2017 |