THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:28:23 AM
Ghodsi, Narges
CPSO#:
108006
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jan 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jan 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Mazandaran University of Med. Sciences, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Village Medical Center
Family Practice and Walk-In
5-10288 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 3B8
Phone: (905) 237-8630
Fax: (905) 237-8632
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NARGES GHODSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHODSI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Oct 2015 to 12 Jan 2016
PEAP - R - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2018 |