THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:45:47 AM
Anderson, Alethea Jean
CPSO#:
108004
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Oct 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Apr 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. Matthew's University, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rugged Shores Family Health
60 Bowes Street, Suite 101
Parry Sound ON P2A 2L3
Phone: (705) 746-2181
Fax: 7057464753
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Apr 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALETHEA JEAN ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Oct 2015 to 12 Jan 2016
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2016 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 May 2016 to 01 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2017 |