THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:33:29 PM
Shih, Jeffrey Gi-Gein
CPSO#:
107982
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Connecticut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:16 Sep 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2015 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jan 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jan 2017 |
|
Active |