THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:11:41 AM
Putzer, Darryl Arthur
CPSO#:
107959
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3M Centre, Western University
1151 Richmond St
London ON N6A 3K7
Phone: 519-661-3011
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jul 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DARRYL ARTHUR PUTZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUTZER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Oct 2015 to 30 Oct 2015
EL - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
AVP - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 07 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Jul 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2017 |