THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:11:40 PM
Pathak, Rahul Shivaji
CPSO#:
107958
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Neurology & Pain Clinic
3075 Hospital Gate
Unit 309
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: 905-847-0041
Fax: 905-847-3131
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pain Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Neurology |
Effective:06 Feb 2024 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Sep 2015 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 09 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jun 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jun 2017 |
|
Active |