THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 1:44:54 AM
Sebastian, Shruti Alice
CPSO#:
107903
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Noojmowin-Teg Health Centre
Aundeck Omni Kaning First Nation
48 Hillside Dr
Highway 540
Little Current ON P0P 1K0
Phone: (705) 368-0083
Fax: (705) 368-3922
Electoral District: 08
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Manitoulin Health Centre |
Little Current |
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site |
Mindemoya |
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake |
Elliot Lake |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Sep 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHRUTI ALICE SEBASTIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEBASTIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 22 Sep 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 20 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2017 |