THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 13:12:45 PM
Mozafarian, Mona
CPSO#:
107870
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Sleep Disorder Clinic
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 7S6
Phone: 905-529-2259
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jul 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2015 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 13 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2017 |
|
Active |