THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:33:32 PM
Kaushik, Chhavi
CPSO#:
107784
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Nov 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Oct 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Rajasthan University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:10 May 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHHAVI KAUSHIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUSHIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Nov 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Oct 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2021 |