THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:22:04 AM
Wharton, Aidan Stephen
CPSO#:
107771
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Emergency Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Espanola General Hospital |
Espanola |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Feb 1988 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AIDAN STEPHEN WHARTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHARTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 31 Aug 2015 to 27 Sep 2015
EL - Emergency Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2016 |