THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:06:17 PM
Foster, Christine Frances
CPSO#:
107301
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Columbia University, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
103 - 2200 Fairview St
Burlington ON L7R 4H9
Phone: (905) 639-0884
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Drs. Foster and Robbins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2022
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Northwest Territories
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Englehart and District Hospital |
Englehart |
Kirkland and District Hospital |
Kirkland Lake |
Lady Dunn Health Centre |
Wawa |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
Sante Manitouwadge Health |
Manitouwadge |
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake |
Elliot Lake |
Wilson Memorial General Hospital |
Marathon |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE FRANCES FOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOSTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 18 Sep 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2019 |