THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:23:47 PM
Johal, Herman Singh
CPSO#:
107293
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Queen's University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hosptial
MacOrtho Trauma and Reconstructon
Floor 5N
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 46607
Fax: 905-521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. H. Johal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HERMAN SINGH JOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2015 |