THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:51:31 AM
de Jesus, Christopher Filemon
CPSO#:
107237
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201 Deacon Street
Tower C - C102
Pembroke ON K8A 2J6
Phone: 613-732-2164
Fax: 613-732-2158
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: de Jesus Legare-Archambault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 16 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:26 Jul 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER FILEMON DE JESUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE JESUS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 26 Jul 2015
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2015 |