THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 1:20:59 AM
Lim, Zachary Sern Yuan
CPSO#:
107197
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
126 Mississaga St E
Orillia ON L3V 1V7
Phone: 7055581700
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:03 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZACHARY SERN YUAN LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 2021 |