THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
08/05/24 1:37:05 AM
Weissler-Snir, Adaya
CPSO#:
107188
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv Uni, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Sep 2015
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |