THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 4:05:26 AM
Mofid, Azadeh
CPSO#:
107059
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
204
1139 Alloy Drive
Thunder Bay ON P7B6M8
Phone: (807) 345-1170
Fax: (807) 768-1580
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AZADEH MOFID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOFID is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
AVP - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2019 |