THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:53:45 PM
Onlock, Michelle
CPSO#:
107052
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S.G. Onlock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:15 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHELLE ONLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONLOCK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
AVP - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2020 |