THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:12:08 PM
Walker, Kirsten Ann
CPSO#:
107030
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
28 Apr 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Douglas R. Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:28 Dec 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 29 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 29 Dec 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 28 Dec 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 29 Dec 2019 to 28 Apr 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Apr 2020 |