THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:00:13 PM
Kwok, Trevor
CPSO#:
106807
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
28 Jul 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:08 Jun 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 27 Jul 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2021 |