THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:16:14 AM
Kherani, Irfan Nizarali
CPSO#:
106580
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing 6-411
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5317
Fax: (416) 603-5333
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:03 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IRFAN NIZARALI KHERANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHERANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 2020 |