THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:17:48 PM
Goldberg, Nicola Robyn
CPSO#:
106526
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Mar 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
Odette Cancer Center
T-Wing, Second Floor
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4662
Fax: 416-480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Nov 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:23 Sep 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICOLA ROBYN GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 18 Nov 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 25 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 12 Jan 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 14 Nov 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2024 to 13 Nov 2024
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2020 |