THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 7:00:41 AM
Tung, Stephanie Shiu Yee
CPSO#:
106522
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie St
GS-71A
HOSPITAL-BASED. NO OUTPT REFERRALS
REFERRAL OF FORMER PTs IS WELCOME
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (647)362-9640
Fax: (647)480-5062
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:09 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE SHIU YEE TUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Jul 2021
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2020 |