THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:11:32 AM
Kraus, Nicole Claire
CPSO#:
106463
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Oct 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Respirology
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:19 Oct 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICOLE CLAIRE KRAUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAUS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Respirology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Sep 2022
CF - Respirology
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Respirology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2023 to 05 Nov 2023
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2023 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2023 |