THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:44:01 AM
Ding, Jonathan Yin Chong
CPSO#:
106456
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 11210
Fax: (905) 428-8277
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site |
Mindemoya |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
McCausland Hospital |
Terrace Bay |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JONATHAN YIN CHONG DING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DING is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2017 |