THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:44:34 PM
Patrie, Melanie Florence
CPSO#:
106400
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3400 Hwy 144
Chelmsford ON P0M 1L0
Phone: (705) 855-1018
Fax: (705) 855-9007
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MELANIE FLORENCE PATRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATRIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 19 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Dec 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2017 |