THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:44:10 AM
Bilbily, Matthew Fady Janan
CPSO#:
106308
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: New York Univ School of Medicine, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:25 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW FADY JANAN BILBILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILBILY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 26 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 25 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 26 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 25 Sep 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 26 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 25 Sep 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Sep 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2020 |