THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:44:25 PM
Alkenbrack, Kaleigh Elizabeth
CPSO#:
106269
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: 647-317-3930
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KALEIGH ELIZABETH ALKENBRACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALKENBRACK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jan 2018
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2018 |