THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:11:25 AM
Golian, Azarm
CPSO#:
106248
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of Calgary, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4256 Bathurst Street, Suite 306
Toronto ON M3H 5Y8
Phone: 416-222-3011
Fax: 416-221-3097
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AZARM GOLIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2017 |