THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:13:41 AM
Keller, Maryam Maria
CPSO#:
106236
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Khami, Maryam Maria (used until: 17 May 2018 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Suite 100
Nepean ON K2H8P4
Phone: 613-721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital |
Perth |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:15 Oct 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARYAM MARIA KELLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2017 |