THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:31:40 AM
Hwang, David Wei-De
CPSO#:
106151
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
02 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
5th floor room 5-700
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bridgepoint Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 Oct 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Feb 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Feb 2017 |
|
Active |