THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 23:13:13 PM
Laschuk, Matthew Joseph
CPSO#:
106141
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
214-2425 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8W 1E6
Phone: 519-419-1746
Fax: 519-790-0606
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:15 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JOSEPH LASCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LASCHUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2020 to 31 Jul 2021
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2020 |