THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 20:29:31 PM
Schneider, Evan
CPSO#:
106032
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2015
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre
60 Murray Street, 4th Floor
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 7884
Fax: 416-586-4804
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2017 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EVAN SCHNEIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNEIDER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2017 |